Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0875378

EP0875378 - Clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mülheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mühlheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schild, Helmut
Im Wingertsgrund 148
61449 Steinbach/Ts. / DE
[1998/45]
Representative(s)Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG
Intellectual Property (IPB)
Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [1998/45]Stahl, Dietmar
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung FTB/S, Postfach 101264
63012 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date98106692.111.04.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateDE199711823430.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19718234
[1998/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0875378
Date:04.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0875378
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0875378
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41F27/12
[1998/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/38]
Former [1999/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  LI 
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klemmeinrichtung[1998/45]
English:Clamping device[1998/45]
French:Dispositif de serrage[1998/45]
Examination procedure16.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
19.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.05.1999Fee for grant paid
18.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.12.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.04.2001   
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/24]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2001   
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
D-69115 Heidelberg / DE
31.05.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.11.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.04.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.04.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.08.1999CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.08.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.07.2000
GB19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
BE30.04.2001
[2006/32]
Former [2004/45]GB19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
BE30.04.2001
Former [2003/09]NL19.07.2000
BE30.04.2001
Former [2002/29]BE30.04.2001
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3401351  (KIEPER HORST);
 [AD]DE2606773  (BOCK ERICH);
 [AD]DE4129831  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE])
Opposition   - Formelsammlung Technische Mechanik, Institut für Mechanik, 1978, Seite 36,
    - Hoischer, Technisches Zeichnen, 17. Auflage, Seiten 60-61,