Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0872700

EP0872700 - Method and apparatus for detecting mines using radiometry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW INC.
One Space Park Redondo Beach
California 90278 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Yujiri, Mikio Larry
2621 Plaza Del Amo, No. 504
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
02 / Shoucri, Merit M.
1334 23rd Street
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98106787.915.04.1998
[1998/43]
Priority number, dateUS1997084358716.04.1997         Original published format: US 843587
[1998/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0872700
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0872700
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41H11/12, G01S7/292
[2000/36]
Former International [1998/43]F41H11/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/25]
Former [1998/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Landminen mittels Radiometrie[1998/43]
English:Method and apparatus for detecting mines using radiometry[1998/43]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour repérer des mines terrestres[1998/43]
Examination procedure18.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
27.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4521861  (LOGAN RUSSELL H [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - line 61 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 19 * * column 9, line 31 - line 60 * [A] 9,12;
 [A]IL110611  (ISRAEL STATE [IL]) [A] 1;
 []US5638164  (LANDAU UZI [IL]) [ ] * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - line 55 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 52 * * column 8, line 33 - line 51 *;
 [YA]DE4242541  (TZN FORSCHUNG & ENTWICKLUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 2,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 64 * [A] 3;
 [A]US5214281  (ROWE DOUGLAS J [CA]) [A] 1,2,9,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 23 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 18 *
 [Y]  GROSCH H, "UEBERWINDEN DURCH UEBERLISTEN", SOLDAT UND TECHNIK,DE,UMSCHAU VERLAG. FRANKFURT AM MAIN, (19960901), vol. 39, no. 9, ISSN 0038-0989, pages 590 - 592,594-595, XP000622385 [Y] 2,6,7 * page 592, column L, paragraph 6 - column M, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  HEWISH M ET AL, "MINE-DETECTION TECHNOLOGIES", INTERNATIONAL DEFENSE REVIEW,CH,INTERAVIA, COINTRIN- GENEVA, (19951001), vol. 28, no. 10, ISSN 0020-6512, pages 38 - 40,42-45, XP000542649 [A] 6 * page 44, column R, paragraph 3 - page 45, paragraph L *