Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0872352

EP0872352 - Image recording device having detachable web roll cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Higashi, Takashi
c/o Brother Kogyo K.K., 15-1, Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Shibata, Yasuhiro
c/o Brother Kogyo K.K., 15-1, Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Yamaguchi, Koshiro
c/o Brother Kogyo K.K., 15-1, Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Sugimoto, Kiyoshi
c/o Brother Kogyo K.K., 15-1, Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date98106807.515.04.1998
[1998/43]
Priority number, dateJP1997009696415.04.1997         Original published format: JP 9696497
[1998/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0872352
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0872352
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41J15/04, B41J11/70
[1998/43]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1999/26]
Former [1998/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildaufzeichnungsgerät mit abnehmbarer Bandrollenkassette[1998/43]
English:Image recording device having detachable web roll cassette[1998/43]
French:Dispositif d'enregistrement d'images comportant une cassette de bobine amovible[1998/43]
Examination procedure15.04.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
31.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/22]
24.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.06.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.1999Fee for grant paid
14.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5982250  ;
 [A]JPH0916815  ;
 [A]US4854519  (MAEDA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,13 * column 3, line 24 - line 28 * * column 5, line 1 - line 7; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]JPS6077055
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840904), vol. 008, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 322), & JP59082250 A 19840512 (CANON KK) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 13, Database accession no. 97-137419, XP002065856 & JPH0916815 A 00000000 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850906), vol. 009, no. 219, Database accession no. (M - 410), & JP60077055 A 19850501 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *
by applicantUS5232297
 JPH08233675
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP08233675 A 00000000