Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899452

EP0899452 - Liquid filter for filtering fuel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Blasquez, Ivan Garcia
Felipe Herranz, 17
28033 Madrid / ES
02 / Torres, Enrique Casillas
Parades de Hava No. 12
28017 Madrid / ES
[1999/09]
Application number, filing date98106901.615.04.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateDE199713719227.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19737192
[1999/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0899452
Date:03.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0899452
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0899452
Date:09.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/22
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsfilter zum Reinigen von Kraftstoff[1999/09]
English:Liquid filter for filtering fuel[1999/09]
French:Filtre pour liquides pour filtrer du carburant[1999/09]
Examination procedure23.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
03.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB09.07.2003
ES20.10.2003
[2004/46]
Former [2004/22]GB09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5433241  (ROBINSON BARRY S [US]) [AD] 1,2,7,12-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]FR2743506  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2,7,9,11,13 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 10; figures 1-3 *;
 [AP]EP0819458  (FILTRAUTO [FR]) [AP] 1,7,12,13 * abstract * * column 4, line 31 - column 7, line 56; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0701059  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1,7,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 24; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5078167  (BRANDT TIMOTHY B [US], et al)
by applicantUS5433241