EP0872446 - Hydraulic installation for a forklift truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARTMANN & LÄMMLE GMBH & CO. KG Schuckertstrasse 15 71277 Rutesheim / DE | [2002/23] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states HARTMANN + LÄMMLE GMBH & CO. KG Schuckertstrasse 15 71277 Rutesheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Schulze, Eckehart Stahlbühlstrasse 36 71287 Weissach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Eckehart Stahlbühlstrasse 36 71277 Rutesheim / DE | [2002/20] |
Former [1998/43] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lutz, Johannes Dieter, et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Lutz, Johannes Dieter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107020.4 | 17.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | DE1997116442 | 20.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716442 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0872446 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0872446 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872446 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/22 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B66F9/22 (EP);
F15B11/05 (EP);
F15B13/015 (EP);
F15B13/044 (EP);
F15B2211/30525 (EP);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/351 (EP);
F15B2211/353 (EP);
F15B2211/6313 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/02] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydraulik-Installation an einem Gabelstapler-Fahrzeug | [1998/43] | English: | Hydraulic installation for a forklift truck | [1998/43] | French: | Installation hydraulique pour chariot élévateur à fourche | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0498610 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 52 * * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 30 * * figures 2-4,7,8 *; | [A]EP0546300 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 46 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE3441946 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5036886 (OLSEN ZENNY [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 27 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 38 * * figures 1,8 * |