Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0875673

EP0875673 - Method for controlling an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, Hong, Dr.
Brandlberger Strasse 138
93057 Regensburg / DE
02 / Fröhlich, Johann
Bayerwaldstrasse 51 D
84030 Landshut / DE
[1998/45]
Application number, filing date98107031.117.04.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateDE199711871902.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19718719
[1998/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0875673
Date:04.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0875673
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0875673
Date:20.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/08, F02D31/00, F02D41/14
[1998/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/51]
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Steuern einer Brennkraftmaschine[1998/45]
English:Method for controlling an internal combustion engine[1998/45]
French:Méthode de commande d'un moteur à combustion interne[1998/45]
Examination procedure23.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
28.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2003Fee for grant paid
16.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5245966  (ZHANG HONG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 12 - line 22 * * column 5, line 40 - line 56 * * column 7, line 53 - line 61 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4405340  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 18 *;
 [A]DE4202407  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * * claim 6 * * figure . *;
 [A]  ADLER URLICH, Kraftfahrtechnisches Taschenbuch - Bosch, DÜSSELDORF, BOSCH GMBH, XP002129848 [A] 7 * page 473 - page 474 *
by applicantDE4304779