Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0863471

EP0863471 - Semiconductor integrated circuit with two supply voltages [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP
Former [1998/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohara, Kazutake
4-13-317, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
[1998/37]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107368.718.01.1995
[1998/37]
Priority number, dateJP1994000402419.01.1994         Original published format: JP 402494
[1998/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0863471
Date:09.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0863471
Date:17.02.1999
[1999/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863471
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50, H03K19/00
[1999/06]
Former International [1998/37]G06F17/50
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/37]
TitleGerman:Intergrierte Halbleiterschaltung mit zwei Versorgungsspannungen[1998/37]
English:Semiconductor integrated circuit with two supply voltages[1998/37]
French:Circuit intégré à semi-conducteur avec deux tensions d'alimentation[1998/37]
Examination procedure22.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/37]
09.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95100625.3  / EP0664517
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[DXY]JPH05299624  ;
 [DYA]JPH0567963  ;
 [A]JPH04253366  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,6-13;
 []US5352942  (TANAKA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 1, line 1 - line 68 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 65 * * column 10, line 25 - column 11, line 20 * * column 14, line 40 - column 17, line 11; figures 2,3,7,13-15 *;
 [A]US5119314  (HOTTA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 2 * * column 7, line 22 - column 7, line 62; figure 15 *;
 [DXY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940216), vol. 018, no. 095, Database accession no. (E - 1509), & JP05299624 A 19931112 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DX] 1,2,19,20 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6
 [DYA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930720), vol. 017, no. 386, Database accession no. (E - 1401), & JP05067963 A 19930319 (HITACHI LTD; OTHERS: 01) [DY] 6 * abstract * [A] 7-13
 [A]  - KOJIMA H ET AL, "Half-swing clocking scheme for 75% power saving in clocking circuitry", 1994 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS (CAT. NO.94CH3434-8), PROCEEDINGS OF 1994 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS, HONOLULU, HI, USA, 9-11 JUNE 1994, ISBN 0-7803-1918-4, 1994, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 23 - 24, XP002087571 [A] 9
 [A]  - E. J. MCCLUSKEY, Logic Design Principles, ENGLEWOOD CLIFFS, NEW JERSEY, PRENTICE-HALL, (1986), 539784, XP002087572 [A] 14 * page 439 - page 440 *