Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0875803

EP0875803 - Apparatus for developing a latent image and electrophotographic process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/45]Organic coated development electrodes and methods thereof
[2003/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Laing, John R.
124 Trafalgar Street
Rochester, NY 14619 / US
02 / Gutman, Edward J.
728 Mariner Circle
Webster, NY 14580 / US
03 / Kittelberger, Stephen J.
160 Penarrow Road
Rochester, NY 14618 / US
04 / VanDusen, John G.
3624 Ontario Center Road
Walworth, NY 14568 / US
05 / Ahuja, Suresh K.
1192 Gatestone Circle
Webster, NY 14580 / US
06 / Scharfe, Merlin E.
273 Valley Green Drive
Penfield, NY 14526 / US
07 / Schank, Richard L.
9 French Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
08 / Hirsch, Mark J.
74 Selborne Chase
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
09 / Badesha, Santokh S.
48 Bromley Raod
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
10 / Henry, Arnold W.
43 Deer Creek Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
11 / Heeks, George J.
72 Oakcrest Drive
Rochester, NY 14617 / US
[1998/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107438.823.04.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateUS1997084113629.04.1997         Original published format: US 841136
[1998/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0875803
Date:04.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0875803
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0875803
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08
[1998/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zum Entwickeln eines latenten Bildes und elektrophotographischer Prozess[2003/21]
English:Apparatus for developing a latent image and electrophotographic process[2003/21]
French:Dispositif de développement d'une image latente et procédé électrophotographique[2003/21]
Former [1998/45]Mit organischen Material beschichteten Entwicklungselektroden und Verfahren dafür
Former [1998/45]Organic coated development electrodes and methods thereof
Former [1998/45]Electrodes de développement revêtues d'un matériau organique et méthodes associées
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
12.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2003Fee for grant paid
24.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[PX]US5701553  (ENDO ISAO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,6,10 * column 15, line 23 - line 32 * * column 44, line 51 - line 65; figures 8,9 *;
 [X]JPH08110697  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [X] 1,2,6,10;
 [DX]US5124749  (BARES JAN [US]) [DX] 1,2,6-10 * column 8, line 8 - line 48 * * column 5, line 24 - line 42; figures 2,4,5 *;
 [DX]US4868600  (HAYS DAN A [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,10 * column 8, line 3 - line 43 * * column 5, line 20 - line 24; figures 3,4 *;
 [E]EP0875802  (XEROX CORP [US]) [E] 1-4,6-8,10 * column 12, line 19 - line 49; figures 1-4 *;
 [E]EP0875801  (XEROX CORP [US]) [E] 1-4,6-10 * column 11, line 9 - line 11; figures 1-4; claims 5-7 *