blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0874420 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0874420



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 48
21.04.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.03.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
04.06.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
17.01.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
09.11.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.11.2001 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
13.10.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
01.12.1998 Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed Search / examination 1
19.11.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.04.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
24.04.1998 Description Search / examination 6
24.04.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.04.1998 Priority document Search / examination 11
24.04.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6