blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0874420
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH10302898Global Dossier 13.11.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19717628 25.04.1997
CA2240731 10.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0874420Global Dossier 12.01.2000A3
EP0874420 28.10.1998A2
Priority number Date
DE19717628 25.04.1997
CA2240731 10.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2240731 10.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19717628 25.04.1997
CA2240731 10.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19717628 29.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19717628 25.04.1997
CA2240731 10.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6194654 27.02.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19717628 25.04.1997
CA2240731 10.07.1998