Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0874420

EP0874420 - Shield connection system and connector using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
74080 Heilbronn / DE
For all designated states
ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Deutschland) GmbH
Am Rathenaupark
16761 Hennigsdorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]For all designated states
AMPHENOL-TUCHEL ELECTRONICS GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
D-74080 Heilbronn / DE
For all designated states
ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Deutschland) GmbH
Am Rathenaupark
16761 Hennigsdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bühler, Roland
Neipperger Höhe 11
74080 Heilbronn / DE
02 / Ott, Frank
Haupstr. 104
16515 Oranienburg / DE
[1999/03]
Former [1998/44]01 / Bühler, Roland
Neipperger Höhe 11
74080 Heilbronn / DE
02 / Otto, Frank
Haupstr. 104
16515 Oranienburg / DE
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/12]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/01]Rox, Thomas Dr. , et al
Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 02 29
40435 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1998/44]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107514.624.04.1998
[1998/44]
Priority number, dateDE199711762825.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19717628
[1998/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0874420
Date:28.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0874420
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/658, H01R9/03, H01R9/05, H01R13/58
[2000/02]
Former International [1998/44]H01R13/658, H01R9/03
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1998/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abschirmungsverbindungssystem und dieses verwendender Verbinder[1998/44]
English:Shield connection system and connector using the same[1998/44]
French:Système de connexion d'écran de connexion et connecteur utilisant celui-ci[1998/44]
Examination procedure28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2002
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5174769  (DEARMAN KENNETH W J [GB]) [X] 1,12 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,10;
 [A]US5474473  (PERRETTA FREDERICK A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 55 *;
 [A]EP0724310  (ENGINEERED TRANSITIONS [US]) [A] 1,11,12 * column 3, line 28 - column 6, line 59 *