Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0875627

EP0875627 - Profiled mat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/45]Profiled marking
[2002/28]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Minerals ( Moers) GmbH
Clausthalstrasse 2
47441 Moers / DE
[2004/05]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
Svedala Industri (Deutschland) GmbH
Christinenstrasse 12
40880 Ratingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Siebertz, Dietmar
Am Heinichenberg 9
63486 Bruchköbel / DE
02 / Denschel, Manfred
Tannenallee 73
21465 Reinbeck / DE
[1998/45]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107634.227.04.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateDE199711793529.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19717935
DE1998201113U23.01.1998         Original published format: DE 29801113 U
[1998/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0875627
Date:04.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0875627
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0875627
Date:23.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:E01F9/053, E01F9/011
[2000/21]
Former International [1998/45]E01F9/053
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/05]
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Profilmatte[1998/45]
English:Profiled mat[2002/28]
French:Natte profilée[2002/28]
Former [1998/45]Profiled marking
Former [1998/45]Marquage profilé
Examination procedure23.02.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
24.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
25.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
02.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2003Fee for grant paid
03.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DXY]DE9415432U  (SIEBERTZ DIETMAR [DE], et al) [DX] 1-3,9 * the whole document * [Y] 4,7,8,10;
 [YA]GB2288419  (BEVERIDGE BENJAMIN [GB]) [Y] 4,7,8 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure 3 * [A] 1;
 [YA]FR2686104  (NOANE GEORGES LE [FR], et al) [Y] 10 * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 13; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-9;
 [A]GB2120711  (ROCOL LTD) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 36 - line 57; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB689791  (IND CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 1,2,10 * page 1, line 9 - line 12; figure - *;
 [A]US1740501  (ECKSTRAND RUDOLPH C)
by applicantDE9415432U