Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0875935

EP0875935 - Semiconductor device having a projecting electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shoji, Kazutaka
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
[1998/45]
Representative(s)von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys.
SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107645.827.04.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateJP1997011084028.04.1997         Original published format: JP 11084097
[1998/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0875935
Date:04.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0875935
Date:02.08.2000
[2000/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/485
[1998/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2001/15]
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterelement mit einer herausragenden Elektrode[1998/45]
English:Semiconductor device having a projecting electrode[1998/45]
French:Dispositif semi-conducteur comprenant une électrode saillante[1998/45]
Examination procedure23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
02.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
03.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0831525  (NEC CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-5,7,8,10 * page 10 *;
 [YA]JPH05218039  ;
 [XY]JPH07122595  ;
 [XA]US5272376  (UENO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 8 * column 3, line 30 - line 66; figure 3 * [A] 1;
 [XA]JPH05218046  ;
 [XA]JPH02234447
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931206), vol. 017, no. 657, Database accession no. (E - 1470), [Y] 1,3-5,10 * the whole document * [A] 8
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, [X] 8 * abstract * [Y] 1,3-5,10
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931206), vol. 017, no. 657, Database accession no. (E - 1470), [X] 8 * abstract * [A] 1
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901204), vol. 014, no. 546, Database accession no. (E - 1008), [X] 8,10 * abstract * [A] 1