Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878681

EP0878681 - Firing control apparatus and firing control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 25.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KAISHA LTD.
1-53, 2-chome, Shitte Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa-ken 230 / JP
For all designated states
INAX CORPORATION
5-1 Koiehonmachi
Tokoname-shi, Aichi 479 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KAISHA LTD.
1-53, 2-chome, Shitte
Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 230 / JP
For all designated states
INAX CORPORATION
5-1 Koiehonmachi
Tokoname-Shi, Aichi 479 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yasuda, Tsutomu
13-18, Ikohoncho 2-chome, Adachi-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Hamada, Yoichiro
c/o INAX Corporation, 5-1, Koiehonmachi
Tokoname-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 33 09 20
80069 München / DE
Former [1999/50]Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich
Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20
80069 München / DE
Former [1998/47]DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107653.227.04.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateJP1997010862025.04.1997         Original published format: JP 10862097
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0878681
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0878681
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F27B9/40, F27D19/00, F27D17/00, F28D17/04
[2002/39]
Former International [1998/47]F27B9/40, F27D19/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2003/24]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Feuerungskontrolle[1998/47]
English:Firing control apparatus and firing control method[1998/47]
French:Appareil et méthode pour le contrôle de la cuisson[1998/47]
Examination procedure26.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/03]
12.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.05.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0962702  (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-11 * the whole text *;
 [PX]EP0770833  (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KK [JP]) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0607921  (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0736732  (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *