Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893844

EP0893844 - Heating conductor connection system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2007  [2007/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Deutschland GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2006/08]
Former [2002/06]For all designated states
Airbus Deutschland GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
EADS Airbus GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kirma, Safa, Dipl.-Ing.
Holunderstrasse 34
22880 Wedel / DE
02 / Stöver, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Lindenstrasse 36
21684 Stade / DE
03 / Pfeiff, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Weidenring 9b
21629 Neuwulmsdorf / DE
04 / Erdmann, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Wismarer Strasse 28
21614 Buxtehude / DE
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Hansmann, Dierk
Patentanwälte
Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann
Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date98107661.528.04.1998
[1999/04]
Priority number, dateDE199712641823.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19726418
[1999/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0893844
Date:27.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0893844
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0893844
Date:22.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R24/00, H01R13/62, H01R13/52
[2006/06]
Former International [2000/15]H01R23/02, H01R13/62, H01R13/52
Former International [1999/04]H01R4/20, H01R4/70, H01R9/03
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/51]
Former [1999/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Heizleiter-Verbindungssystem[1999/04]
English:Heating conductor connection system[1999/04]
French:Système de connexion pour conducteur de chauffage[2006/05]
Former [1999/04]Systeme de connexion pour conducteur de chauffage
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
19.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2005Fee for grant paid
29.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2683419  (AAA TELEC [FR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0187636  (BARLIAN REINHOLD [DE]) [A] 11 * page 14, lines 16-20 *;
 [A]US3657513  (HOWARD LAWRENCE) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8504019U  (SEBERT K. , REIMER K.) [A] * figures 2,3; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH10233247  ;
 [A]DE1893605U  (MONETTE ASBESTDRAHT G M B H [DE]) [A] * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, [A] * abstract *