Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0877399

EP0877399 - Barium titanate-magnesium ceramic for use in capacitors or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD.
16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo 110 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD.
16-20, Ueno 6-chome
Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iguchi, Yoshiaki
343-14, Kamiooshima, Haruna-machi
Gunma-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Honda, Mutsumi
1222-22, Taguchimachi
Maebashi-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
03 / Kishi, Hiroshi
1203, Higashihirai
Fujioka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
[1998/46]
Representative(s)Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr. , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date98107958.530.04.1998
[1998/46]
Priority number, dateJP1997013285106.05.1997         Original published format: JP 13285197
[1998/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0877399
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0877399
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0877399
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01G4/12
[1998/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2000/37]
Former [1998/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bariumtitanat-Magnesium Keramik zur Verwendung, u.a., in Kondensatoren[1998/46]
English:Barium titanate-magnesium ceramic for use in capacitors or the like[1998/46]
French:Céramique titanate de barium-magnésium pour utilisation, entre autres, dans des condensateurs[1998/46]
Examination procedure06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
03.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2004Fee for grant paid
01.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0504756  (TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD.) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 19 - line 25 * * claims 1,4 *