Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878628

EP0878628 - Pressure transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Filtertek B.V.
Industrial Estate, Newcastle West
County of Limerick / IE
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
Filtertek B.V.
Industrial Estate, Newcastle West, Co.
Limerick / IE
Inventor(s)01 / Myers, Jan Willem Marinus
Mecklenburgstraat 9
5913 TP Venlo / NL
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Brose, D. Karl , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b
82319 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Brose, D. Karl , et al
Patentanwälte Brose & Brose Postfach 11 64
82301 Starnberg / DE
Application number, filing date98108225.806.05.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateDE1997208673U15.05.1997         Original published format: DE 29708673 U
[1998/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0878628
Date:18.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0878628
Date:20.01.1999
[1999/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0878628
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F15B3/00, A61M1/36, // B29C65/08
[1998/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [1999/39]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckübertragungsvorrichtung[1998/47]
English:Pressure transmission device[1998/47]
French:Dispositif de transfert de pression[1998/47]
Examination procedure26.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/21]
30.03.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
24.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
09.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2000Fee for grant paid
05.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2000  16.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Industrie Borla Spa
Via G. di Vittorio, 7bis
10024 Moncalieri (Torino) / IT
Opponent's representative
Buzzi, Franco
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2009/38]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2000  16.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Industrie Borla Spa
Via G. di Vittorio, 7bis
10024 Moncalieri (Torino) / IT
Opponent's representative
Buzzi, Franco
c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18
10123 Torino / IT
Former [2001/07]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2000   
Industrie Borla Spa
Via G. di Vittorio, 7bis
10024 Moncalieri (Torino) / IT
Opponent's representative
Buzzi, Franco
c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Corso Fiume, 6
10133 Torino / IT
12.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.06.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.05.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
12.05.2002Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/40]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0652018  (BORLA IND [IT]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 50 - line 52; figure - *;
 [A]US3966520  (FALLENBECK EBERHARDT G, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 18 * * column 1, line 39 - line 49 *;
 [A]US4459139  (VONREIS CHARLES E [US], et al);
 [XP]DE29708673U  (FILTERTEK BV [IE]) [XP] 1-6 * the whole document *