Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0882901

EP0882901 - Method of manufacturing a bearing assembly and bearing assembly manufactured according to it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heinemann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Dettmersberg 19
38165 Lehre / DE
[1998/50]
Application number, filing date98108237.306.05.1998
[1998/50]
Priority number, dateDE199712338004.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19723380
[1998/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0882901
Date:09.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0882901
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0882901
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02F7/00, F16C9/02
[2000/01]
Former International [1998/50]F16C43/02, F16C9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [1998/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Lageranordnung und danach hergestellte Lageranordnung[1998/50]
English:Method of manufacturing a bearing assembly and bearing assembly manufactured according to it[1998/50]
French:Méthode d'assemblage d'un palier et palier obtenu[1998/50]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
24.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2002Fee for grant paid
01.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2004/04]
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9742424  (ZENITH SINTERED PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,9-11 * page 5, line 1 - page 16, line 12; figures 3-23 *;
 [A]DE3904020  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2560413  (CARLSON GUSTAV W) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 36 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]CH381015  (SULZER AG [CH]) [A] 1-4,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4412514  (HAYAKAWA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 11,12 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0696688
 EP0104535
 EP0068424
 DE19511285
 DE3426208
 DE2938482
 DE2801617