Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0877409

EP0877409 - Resolving power evaluation method for electron microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/46]Resolving power evaluation method and specimen for electron microscope
[2005/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.08.2006  [2006/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
Hitachi Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kitagawa, Taiji
5977-1, Tsujido
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Sato, Mitsugu
1927-32, Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Shimoma, Goroku
636-5, Hakari, Minori-machi
Higashi Ibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
04 / Takahashi, Tadanori
2-3-5, Ushirono
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
05 / Yoshida, Naoto
1227-10, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
06 / Yukii, Masayuki
663 Ichige
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
07 / Ninomiya, Takanori
411-20, Matoi
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
08 / Horiuchi, Tatsuo
4-30, Deguchi-machi
Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
09 / Kawame, Keisuke
3-22, Nagakura-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1998/46]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstraße 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98108340.507.05.1998
[1998/46]
Priority number, dateJP1997011849408.05.1997         Original published format: JP 11849497
JP1997031681118.11.1997         Original published format: JP 31681197
[1998/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0877409
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0877409
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0877409
Date:24.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/28
[1998/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/38]
Former [1998/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Schätzung des Auflösungsvermögens eines Elektronenmikroskops[2005/06]
English:Resolving power evaluation method for electron microscope[2005/06]
French:Méthode d'évaluation du pouvoir de résolution pour microscope électronique[2005/06]
Former [1998/46]Verfahren zur Schätzung des Auflösungsvermögens und Probe für Elektronenmikroskop
Former [1998/46]Resolving power evaluation method and specimen for electron microscope
Former [1998/46]Méthode d'évaluation du pouvoir de résolution et échantillon pour microscope électronique
Examination procedure04.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
18.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2005Fee for grant paid
02.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4068381  (BALLARD DAVID B, et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8-13 * abstract * [A] 4,7,14,15;
 [A]US4677296  (LISCHKE BURKHARD [DE], et al) [A] 4,7,14,15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 2-19 * * column 5, lines 3-25 * * claims 1,4 *;
 [A]FR2733854  (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE ET TECHN [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [YA]  REIMER, L AND G. PFEFFERKORN, Raster-Elektronenmikroskopie, BERLIN, SPRINGER, XP002150601 [Y] 1-3,5,6,8-13 * page 116, line 6 - page 117, line 5 * [A] 4,7,14,15
Examination   SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPY 1974, (197404), pages 327 - 334, XP001203595