Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878327

EP0878327 - A system for connecting a wheel and a brake member to a vehicle wheel hub [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SKF INDUSTRIE S.P.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 83
10123 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
SKF INDUSTRIE S.p.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 83
I-10123 Torino / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Vignotto, Angelo
Via Montevideo n. 48
10134 Torino / IT
02 / Pons, Luciano
Via Villaggio del Sole n. 15
10064 Pinerolo (TO) / IT
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Lotti, Giorgio , et al
c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Lotti, Giorgio , et al
c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98108414.808.05.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateIT1997TO0041115.05.1997         Original published format: IT TO970411
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0878327
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0878327
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60B23/06, B60B27/00, B60T1/06
[2001/20]
Former International [1998/47]B60B23/06
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/07]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zum Verbinden eines Rades und eines Bremselements zur Fahrzeugradnabe[1998/47]
English:A system for connecting a wheel and a brake member to a vehicle wheel hub[1998/47]
French:Système pour connecter une roue et un élément de frein à un moyeu d'une roue de véhicule[1998/47]
Examination procedure17.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/41]
29.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PA]EP0816128  (SKF IND SPA [IT]) [PA] 1,8,9 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5607241  (FUKUMURA YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 6; figure 7 *;
 [A]FR2529628  (MANNECHEZ MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4 - page 5 *;
 [A]US3806214  (KEISER T) [A] 1 * column 2, line 52 - line 58; figure - *