Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878444

EP0878444 - Bio-depurator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bruso' Bortolozzo, Luigi
Sabana Sur 100, Sur de ARESEP Aparts, BonaSort 3
San Jose / CR
[2000/24]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
Bortolozzo, Luigi Bruso'
Sabana Sur 100, Sur de ARESEP Aparts, BonaSort 3
San Jose / CR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Cioni, Carlo
PIPPARELLI & PARTNERS Via Quadronno, 6
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Cioni, Carlo
c/o STUDIO CIONI & PIPPARELLI Viale Caldara 38
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98108512.911.05.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateCR55469712.05.1997         Original published format: CR 554697
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0878444
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0878444
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C02F3/02
[1998/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT [1999/30]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bio-Reiniger[1998/47]
English:Bio-depurator[1998/47]
French:Purificateur biologique[1998/47]
Examination procedure07.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
19.05.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.09.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, IE, MC, SE
14.09.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU
10.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
11.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2002Fee for grant paid
27.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Request for further processing for:20.06.2002Request for further processing filed
20.06.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.07.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.07.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
FR11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
DE12.03.2003
GB11.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/22]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
DE12.03.2003
GB11.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/04]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
DE12.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
DE12.03.2003
Former [2003/51]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT11.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2276617  (ZHOU JITI [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 4; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0555743  (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2705732  (KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH U CO VE) [A] 1,2,4 * figures 1,2; claims 4-7 *;
 [A]DE19511159  (KUNZ PETER M PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, lines 49-54; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE8704522U  (OPATCO AG) [A] 1,2,4 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *