blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0878965 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0878965



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 303
21.11.2006 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.11.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
08.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
25.10.2005 Description Search / examination 1
25.10.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.04.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.05.2000 Description Search / examination 1
23.05.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 4
07.09.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.09.1999 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
31.08.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
31.08.1998 Priority document Search / examination 28
31.08.1998 Priority document Search / examination 39
31.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 44
31.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 59
13.05.1998 Abstract Search / examination 2
13.05.1998 Claims Search / examination 14
13.05.1998 Description Search / examination 56
13.05.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.1998 Drawings Search / examination 19
13.05.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7