blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0878965


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.12.2006 Withdrawal of application published on  03.01.2007  [2007/01]
03.06.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.06.2005 First examination report
15.06.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.06.2003 Renewal fee
11.06.2002 Renewal fee
11.06.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
07.06.2000 Renewal fee
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
02.10.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.11.1998 [1998/47]
02.10.1998 Request for examination filed published on  18.11.1998 [1998/47]