Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878965

EP0878965 - Method for tracking entering object and apparatus for tracking and monitoring entering object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.01.2007  [2007/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HITACHI DENSHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
HITACHI DENSHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Kanda Izumi-cho
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Wataru
40-26-11, Honcho-5-chome
Koganei-shi / JP
02 / Ueda, Hirotada
22-49, Nishimachi-2-chome
Kokubunji-shi / JP
03 / Okada, Toshimichi
40-3-503, Sagamigaoka-1-chome
Zama-shi / JP
04 / Endo, Miyuki
17-1-20-202, Ichibancho-6-chome
Tachikawa-shi / JP
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Gallileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98108707.513.05.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateJP1997012432914.05.1997         Original published format: JP 12432997
JP1997022615322.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22615397
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0878965
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0878965
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/18
[1998/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahrn zur Verfolgung eines eintretenden Objektes und Gerät zu dessen Verfolgung und Überwachung[1998/47]
English:Method for tracking entering object and apparatus for tracking and monitoring entering object[1998/47]
French:Méthode pour la poursuite d'un objet entrant et appareil pour la poursuite et la surveillance d'un tel objet[1998/47]
Examination procedure13.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/47]
20.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH02123877  ;
 [A]US5134472  (ABE SHOZO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6118281
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900731), vol. 014, no. 354, Database accession no. (E - 0958), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860614), vol. 010, no. 168, Database accession no. (E - 411), [A] 1 * abstract *