Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878686

EP0878686 - Weapon control system having weapon stabilization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOLLMORGEN CORPORATION
Reservoir Place, 1601 Trapelo Road
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
KOLLMORGEN CORPORATION
Reservoir Place, 1601 Trapelo Road
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Steve
40 Maynard Road
Northampton, MA 01060 / US
02 / Fydenkevez, Mark
272 Captain Road
Longmeadow, MA 01106 / US
03 / Chuah, Chong-Ket
21555 Welby Terrace
Ashburn, VA 20148 / US
04 / Thibodeau, Dave
10 Doe Hollow Road
Belchertown, MA 01007 / US
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [1998/47]Königseder-Egerer, Claudia D.
Kreuzbichl 1
82491 Grainau / DE
Application number, filing date98108763.814.05.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateUS1997085591914.05.1997         Original published format: US 855919
US1997089501516.07.1997         Original published format: US 895015
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0878686
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0878686
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0878686
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41G3/22, F41G3/16
[2000/12]
Former International [1998/47]F41G3/22
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/48]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Waffensteuerungssystem mit Waffenstabilisierung[1998/47]
English:Weapon control system having weapon stabilization[1998/47]
French:Système de commande d'arme avec stabilisation d'arme[1998/47]
Examination procedure14.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2003Fee for grant paid
15.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4112818  (GAREHIME JR JACOB W) [Y] 1,10 * column A * * column 9, line 44 - column 41, line 21; figures 1-35 * [A] 5-9,17-24;
 [YA]WO8200515  (MARTIN MARIETTA CORP [US]) [Y] 1,10 * abstract * * page 10, line 2 - page 27, line 14; figures 1-11 * [A] 2-5,11-13,17;
 [A]EP0077273  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-5,10-13,17-24 * abstract * * page 3, line 33 - page 8, line 14; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5456157  (LOUGHEED JAMES H [CA], et al) [A] 1,5-10,17-24 * column A * * column 4, line 61 - column 14, line 57; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US3711638  (DAVIES J) [A] 1,5,10,17 * column A * * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-3 *