Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0882827

EP0882827 - Yarn feeder, particularly for yarns with high elongation coefficient, in circular knitting machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANTONI S.p.A.
Via Carlo Fenzi, 14
25135 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]For all designated states
Santoni S.p.A.
Via Carlo Fenzi 14
25135 Brescia / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Lonati, Francesco
Via Valsorda, 28
25100 Brescia / IT
02 / Lonati, Ettore
Via Valsorda, 32
25100 Brescia / IT
03 / Lonati, Fausto
Via Mediana, 12
25100 Brescia / IT
04 / Lonati, Tiberio
Via Sera, 24
25100 Brescia / IT
[1998/50]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98108803.214.05.1998
[1998/50]
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0129502.06.1997         Original published format: IT MI971295
[1998/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0882827
Date:09.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0882827
Date:01.12.1999
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0882827
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:D04B15/46
[1998/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/32]
Former [1998/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fadenliefervorrichtung, insbesondere für Faden mit hohem Dehnungskoeffizient, an Rundstrickmaschinen[2003/02]
English:Yarn feeder, particularly for yarns with high elongation coefficient, in circular knitting machines[1998/50]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation en fil, notamment pour des fils à haut coefficient d'élongation, dans des machines à tricoter circulaires[1998/50]
Former [1998/50]Fadenliefervorrichtung, insbesondere für Faden mit hohem Dehnungskoeffizient, an Rundstrickmachinen
Examination procedure22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
02.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2003Fee for grant paid
01.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200104   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2001
31.05.200205   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1900722  (VATTER NACHF KG J H) [A] 1 * page 24, line 20 - page 25, line 17; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]FR2282009  (REDOUTE [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 24 - page 9, line 32; figures 3-7 *;
 [A]US3017757  (MOYER JAMES D);
 [A]DE1635766  (DENK ANTON, et al);
 [A]DE2507815  (MECMOR SPA)