blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0885926

EP0885926 - Propylene polymer blends, processes of producing the same, and polypropylene resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chisso Corporation
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[2006/33]
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
CHISSO CORPORATION
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okayama, Chikashi
4-14-6, Chiharadai, 1906, Kusakari
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Nakashima, Takanori
8890, Goi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Akitaya, Shinichi
2897-79, Kikuma
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
04 / Sumi, Yoshitaka
A-212-17-2, Tatsumidaihigashi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd, et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98108923.815.05.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateJP1997013217622.05.1997         Original published format: JP 13217697
JP1997013217722.05.1997         Original published format: JP 13217797
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0885926
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0885926
Date:19.05.1999
[1999/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885926
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0885926
Date:16.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:C08L23/14
[1998/52]
CPC:
C08L23/142 (EP,KR,US); C08F210/06 (KR); C08F4/12 (KR);
C08F4/16 (KR); B01J2219/182 (EP,US); C08L2201/10 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (EP,KR,US); C08L23/14 (EP,US); C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR [2001/03]
Former [2000/04]BE,  DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mischung von Propylenpolymeren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Polypropylenzusammensetzung[1998/52]
English:Propylene polymer blends, processes of producing the same, and polypropylene resin compositions[1998/52]
French:Mélange de polymères de propylène, procédé pour leur préparation et composition de polymères[1998/52]
Examination procedure18.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/41]
29.11.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
16.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
17.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2000Fee for grant paid
28.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.12.2001  19.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Abbott Road Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
Opponent's representative
Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al, et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2004/34]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2001  19.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Abbott Road Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
Opponent's representative
Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al, et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2002/07]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2001  19.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Abbott Road Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
Opponent's representative
de Jong, Nicolaas Henricus Maria, et al, et al
Dow Benelux N.V. Patent Department Herbert H. Dowweg 5
4542 NM Hoek / NL
27.03.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.10.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.03.2004Date of oral proceedings
30.04.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.04.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.01.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.04.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
03.07.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.06.2004Appeal received No.  T0802/04
09.09.2004Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
31.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
07.02.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.01.2004
[2004/31]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4547552  (TOYOTA AKINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * page 2, column 2, line 43 - page 3, column 3, line 26 * * page 3, column 3, line 55 - page 3, column 4, line 15 * * page 5, column 8, line 3 - page 5, column 8, line 54 * * page 6, column 9, line 21 - page 6, column 10, line 40 *;
 [X]EP0373660  (HIMONT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8 * page 1, line 41 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 41 * * page 7, line 42 - page 7, line 43 * * page 10, line 26 - page 10, line 41 *;
 [X]EP0472946  (HIMONT INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7* page 2, line 49 - page 4, line 35 *;
 [X]EP0557953  (HIMONT INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 33 *
OppositionUS4728705
 EP0457455
 EP0588581
 EP0863183
    - Kunststoffe, 86, 1996, vol. 8, pp. 1144-1147
    - Polypropylene Handbook, C. Hanser Verlag, Munich, 1996, pp. 190-192, 244-245
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.