Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0885926 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0885926



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 981
19.07.2006 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.07.2006 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.07.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
03.07.2006 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.07.2006 French translation of claims Opposition 3
03.07.2006 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
26.04.2006 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
26.04.2006 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
26.04.2006 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
18.04.2006 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
05.04.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 42
07.02.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
02.01.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.12.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.12.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2005 Annex Appeal 1
15.12.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.12.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 3
15.12.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2005 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
29.09.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
16.09.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.04.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
01.04.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.04.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.02.2005 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
24.01.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.09.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
13.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 48
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 58
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
13.09.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
13.09.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
09.09.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
26.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.07.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.07.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.07.2004 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
29.06.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.06.2004 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.06.2004 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.06.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 12
30.04.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
30.04.2004 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 11
30.04.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 7
30.04.2004 Text intended for grant Opposition 25
09.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
05.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
05.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 12
19.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 13
07.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.10.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 3
18.09.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.10.2002 Claims Opposition 2
07.10.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
12.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.07.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.03.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.03.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.01.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.12.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.12.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.12.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.12.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.12.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 58
21.12.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.12.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.12.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.12.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.12.2001 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 7
21.12.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
20.12.2001 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 9
20.12.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
08.02.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.11.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.11.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.11.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.09.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
30.08.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.05.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.05.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 64
09.05.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
17.04.2000 Description Search / examination 4
17.04.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
16.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.08.1999 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
23.04.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.04.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
07.04.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.04.1999 European search report Search / examination 3
26.08.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.1998 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
20.07.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 41
20.07.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 40
17.07.1998 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
25.05.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 32
25.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 32
15.05.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.05.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
15.05.1998 Description Search / examination 50
15.05.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
15.05.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7