Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0959283

EP0959283 - Valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARI-ARMATUREN ALBERT RICHTER GmbH & Co.KG.
Mergelheide 56-60
33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE
[1999/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Klusmann, Lothar
Eggeweg 150
33617 Bielefeld / DE
02 / Lüke, Heinz
Augustdorfer Strasse 56
33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE
03 / Gerold, Hans-Jürgen
Stadtheider Strasse 32
33609 Bielefeld / DE
04 / Koch, Hans-Werner
Dr. Sonnenschein Strasse 31
33161 Hövelhof / DE
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date98108961.816.05.1998
[1999/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0959283
Date:24.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0959283
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16K35/00, F16K1/32
[1999/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
Former [1999/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ventil[1999/47]
English:Valve[1999/47]
French:Soupape[1999/47]
Examination procedure04.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/47]
23.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2002Fee for grant paid
25.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Former [2007/17]LU31.05.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US1656555  (JOSEPH BROOKS) [A] 1 * page 1, line 60 - line 66; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0651190  (KYOHARA MASAKO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2234052  (FRANZ LUENZ) [A] 1 * page 1, line 40 - line 45; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3456679  (GRAHAM OLLIE W) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - line 19; figure 1 *