blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0871042

EP0871042 - Radio frequency automatic identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GORDIAN HOLDING CORPORATION
8230 Old Courthouse Road, Suite 420 Tysons Corner
Virginia 22182 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
Gordian Holding Corporation
8230 Old Courthouse Road, Suite 420
Tysons Corner, Virginia 22182 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Greene, Morton
4001 N. 9th Street Apt. 1220
Arlington, Virginia 22203 / US
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98109122.624.09.1992
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateUS1991076592524.09.1991         Original published format: US 765925
[1998/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0871042
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0871042
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01S13/02, G06K7/10, G06K19/067, G08B13/24
[1998/42]
CPC:
G08B13/2414 (EP,US); C30B29/18 (EP,US); C30B33/00 (EP,US);
G01S13/753 (EP,US); G06K19/0672 (EP,US); G06K19/07 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US); G06K7/0008 (EP,US); G06K7/10009 (EP,US);
G08B13/2417 (EP,US); G08B13/2422 (EP,US); G08B13/244 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US); G08B13/2445 (EP,US); G08B13/2471 (EP,US);
G08B13/2482 (EP,US); Y10S117/902 (EP,US); Y10T117/1008 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1998/42]
TitleGerman:Automatisches Identifizierungssystem mit Funkfrequenzen[1998/42]
English:Radio frequency automatic identification system[1998/42]
French:Système d'identification automatique de fréquences radio[1998/42]
Examination procedure19.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/42]
19.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1999Fee for grant paid
11.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92921717.2  / EP0605650
Divisional application(s)EP99114530.1  / EP0960961
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.02.2000
LU24.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2005/23]
Former [2002/42]AT16.02.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/08]AT16.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3408086  (SODECO COMPTEURS DE GENEVE [CH]);
 [PA]GB2246492  (SHIMAMURA CHIKARA);
 [PA]DE4042260  (SCHICKEDANZ WILLI [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.