Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0884702

EP0884702 - An electronic information system for the provision of a substitute canteen service for employees [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tekit S.p.A.
Via dei Valtorta 48
20127 Milano / IT
[1998/51]
Inventor(s)01 / DE MONTIS, Massimo
Via dei Valtorta 48
20127 Milano / IT
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Gerbino, Angelo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Gerbino, Angelo , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98109329.722.05.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateIT1997TO0044223.05.1997         Original published format: IT TO970442
[1998/51]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884702
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884702
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/02
[1998/51]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/23]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein elektronisches Informationssystem zur Bereitstellung einer Ersatzkantinendienstleistung für Arbeitnehmer[1998/51]
English:An electronic information system for the provision of a substitute canteen service for employees[1998/51]
French:Système d'information électronique pour fournir un service de restauration de substitution pour employés[1998/51]
Examination procedure21.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
13.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.04.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.04.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2000
31.05.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2605770  (CGA HBS [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 11 - page 7, line 31 *;
 [A]FR2722899  (MARK & SELLER DI FERRACINI RIT [IT]) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 25 - page 10, line 16 *;
 [A]FR2657183  (MITARD ALAIN) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9534822  (KEDIAN ENTERPRISES CHINA GROUP [CN]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2716021  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR])