Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887504

EP0887504 - Door check combined with a lift-off door hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ED. Scharwächter GmbH
Hohenhagener Strasse 26-28
42855 Remscheid / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
ED. Scharwächter GmbH
Hohenhagener-Strasse 26-28
42809 Remscheid / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klüting, Bernd-Alfred
Jung-Stilling-Weg 18
42477 Radevormwald / DE
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Sparing, Rolf Klaus
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Sparing, Rolf Klaus
c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Ing. Horst Bonnekamp Bankstrasse 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/22](deleted)
...
Former [1999/01]Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur
Sonnleiten 7
84164 Moosthenning / DE
Application number, filing date98109401.423.05.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateDE199712709825.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19727098
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0887504
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0887504
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05D11/10
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [2000/50]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit einem aushängbaren Türscharnier baulich vereinigter Türfeststeller[1999/01]
English:Door check combined with a lift-off door hinge[1999/01]
French:Arrêt de porte combiné dans sa construction avec une charnière dégondable[1999/01]
Examination procedure23.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
01.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29614379U  (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10 - page 13; figure - *
by applicantDE19619473