EP0881122 - Indication device, particularly for bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EvoBus GmbH Vaihinger Strasse 131 70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Gorba AG Sandackerstrasse 9245 Oberbüren / CH | [1998/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noll, Barbara Warrengasse 15 89129 Setzingen / DE | 02 /
Nahrgang, Helmut Allensbacher Strasse 14 78476 Allensbach / DE | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109454.3 | 25.05.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | DE1997122682 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19722682 | [1998/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0881122 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0881122 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881122 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/50, B60Q3/02, G09F21/04 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G09F21/04 (EP,US);
B60Q1/5035 (EP,US);
G09F9/3023 (EP);
G09F9/33 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | B60Q1/50, B60Q3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2002/07] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung, insbesondere für Omnibus | [2007/01] | English: | Indication device, particularly for bus | [1998/49] | French: | Dispositif d'indication, en particulier pour autobus | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/49] | Anzeigevorrichtung, insbesondere für Ombnibus | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 17.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, GR, IE, MC | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.02.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | GB | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | LU | 25.05.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | DE | 01.12.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/24] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
GB | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
DE | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
GB | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1565942 (GERMAN PAUL) [X] 1,2,5,8,14 * page 1, lines 1,2 * * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, lines 29-33 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]GB2098374 (BODE & CO GEB) [A] 18,20 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5022171 (NORFOLK ROY [US], et al) [A] 18,19 * abstract * * column 1, lines 12-21 ** figures 1,3 *; | [X]US5471773 (HOFFMAN PETER [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,14 * column 1, lines 39-47 * * column 3, lines 2-15 * * column 4, lines 54-66 * * figure 7 *; | [E]WO9917267 (TRANSIT MEDIA GMBH SYSTEMTECHN [DE], et al) [E] 1-3,5,8,18,20 * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 3 * * page 17, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 20, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,4 * |