Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0889224

EP0889224 - Method for supplying a given fuel quantity to a combustion engine during the starting phase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pabinger, Gerhard
Mayrgutstrasse 10
4451 Garsten / AT
[1999/01]
Application number, filing date98110313.805.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateDE199712872104.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19728721
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0889224
Date:07.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0889224
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/38, F02D41/06, F02D31/00
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/40]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zumessen einer Kraftstoffmenge im Startfall einer Brennkraftmaschine[1999/01]
English:Method for supplying a given fuel quantity to a combustion engine during the starting phase[1999/01]
French:Méthode pour alimenter une quantité de carburant donnée à un moteur à combustion au démarrage[1999/01]
Examination procedure22.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
14.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19528042  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 2 - line 27; claims 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE4329448  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 4; figure 2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS60233344
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860412), vol. 010, no. 096, Database accession no. (M - 469), [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4329448