Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891903

EP0891903 - Automatic emergency brake function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mai, Rudolf
Schlotheimer Strasse 10
38442 Wolfsburg / DE
02 / Lissel, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing.
Grenzweg 13
38442 Wolfsburg / DE
03 / Bergholz, Ralf, Dr.
Dierckestrasse 29
38108 Braunschweig / DE
04 / van Meel, Franciscus
Lehenecke 16A
85113 Böhmfeld / DE
05 / Sinnhuber, Ruprecht
Berliner Ring 25
D-38518 Gifhorn / DE
 [2009/07]
Former [2004/42]01 / Mai, Rudolf
Schlotheimer Strasse 10
38442 Wolfsburg / DE
02 / Lissel, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing.
Grenzweg 13
38442 Wolfsburg / DE
03 / Bergholz, Ralf, Dr.
Dierckestrasse 29
38108 Braunschweig / DE
04 / van Meel, Franciscus
Lehenecke 16A
85113 Böhmfeld / DE
05 / Sinnhuber, Ruprecht
Berliner Ring 25
D-38518 GIFHORN / DE
Former [1999/03]01 / Mai, Rudolf
Schlotheimer Strasse 10
38442 Wolfsburg / DE
02 / Lissel, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing.
Grenzweg 13
38442 Wolfsburg / DE
03 / Bergholz, Ralf, Dr.
Dierckestrasse 29
38108 Braunschweig / DE
04 / van Meel, Franciscus
Lehenecke 16A
85113 Böhmfeld / DE
Application number, filing date98110907.715.06.1998
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateDE199713861104.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19738611
DE199713067617.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19730676
[1999/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0891903
Date:20.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0891903
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891903
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/17, // B60K31/00
[2008/37]
Former International [2000/02]B60T8/00, // B60K31/00
Former International [1999/03]B60T8/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1999/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatische Notbremsfunktion[1999/03]
English:Automatic emergency brake function[1999/03]
French:Fonction automatique de frein de secours[1999/03]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
16.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2008Fee for grant paid
15.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
[2010/05]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5332057  (BUTSUEN TETSURO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,18-25 * The whole document * [A] 13,26;
 [XY]US5230400  (KAKINAMI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,10-13,18-22,24-26 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 42 - line 60 * * column 10, line 4 - line 8 * * figure 1A * [Y] 14-17,27-29;
 [Y]US4987357  (MASAKI ICHIRO [US]) [Y] 14-17,27-29 * column 7, line 17 - line 46 * * Abstract *;; figures 1,5; claim 1 *
by applicantEP0582236
 DE4302527
 DE4218484
 DE4328304
 EP0545437
 GB2262829