blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0884809


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2008  [2008/12]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
08.08.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
16.08.2002 (Expected) grant published on  02.10.2002  [2002/40]
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
06.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant
12.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant
24.08.2001 Change - classification published on  10.10.2001 [2001/41]
07.07.2001 Renewal fee
09.02.2001 Examination report or reply
18.01.2001 Change - extension states
01.12.2000 First examination report
30.11.2000 Examination report or reply
17.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
07.07.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication of search report published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
30.10.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.12.1998 [1998/51]
30.10.1998 Request for examination filed published on  16.12.1998 [1998/51]