Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0884809

EP0884809 - Connector for circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City
Mie 510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tokuwa, Koichiro
c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP
02 / Ichida, Kiyofumi
c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date98110917.615.06.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateJP1997015681913.06.1997         Original published format: JP 15681997
[1998/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884809
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884809
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0884809
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/20
[2001/41]
Former International [1998/51]H01R23/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/01]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steckverbinder für Leiterplatte[1998/51]
English:Connector for circuit board[1998/51]
French:Connecteur pour carte de circuit imprimé[1998/51]
Examination procedure10.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/51]
05.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2002Fee for grant paid
14.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.10.2002
IT02.10.2002
DE03.01.2003
[2008/12]
Former [2006/14]FR02.10.2002
DE03.01.2003
Former [2003/46]DE03.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US4767350  (COOPER RALPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 2 * * column 6, line 48 - line 65; figures 1-10 *;
 [X]US5032085  (ALWINE K TROY [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 22; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US5593307  (BALE ALAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 44; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5249974  (WANG ELSON [TW]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 16 - line 35; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5259773  (CHAMPION PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 8, line 21 - line 60; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]EP0476883  (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0709918  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 *