Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0890806

EP0890806 - Device for connecting two panels together and for adjusting their spatial arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2001 [2001/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lanzani, Oreste
Via Rosselli, 1 25021 Bagnolo Mella
Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
Lanzani, Oreste
Via Rosselli, 1
25021 Bagnolo Mella, Brescia / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/02]
Representative(s)Kratter, Carlo , et al
Giambrocono & C. s.p.a. Via Rosolino Pilo 19 b
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]Kratter, Carlo, Dr. Ing. , et al
Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. s.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19 b
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98111098.417.06.1998
[1999/02]
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0160407.07.1997         Original published format: IT MI971604
[1999/02]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0890806
Date:13.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0890806
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/10, A47B77/08
[2000/19]
Former International [1999/02]F25D23/10
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/03]
Former [1999/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von zwei Platten und zum Justieren ihrer räumlichen Anordnung[1999/02]
English:Device for connecting two panels together and for adjusting their spatial arrangement[1999/02]
French:Dispositif pour raccorder deux panneaux et pour régler leur arrangement spatial[1999/02]
Examination procedure12.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/31]
28.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5471709  (LANZANI ORESTA [IT]) [DX] 1-4,7,8 * column 3, line 18 - line 30 * * column 4, line 25 - line 42 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]EP0718459  (WHIRLPOOL EUROP [NL], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 6, line 34 - line 52 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US2323625  (SEAMAN DAVID J) [A] 6 * figure 4 *;
 [A]GB2050814  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE);
 [A]DE8420711U  (PRÄMETA & CO);
 [A]EP0168672  (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE]);
 [A]GB1336046  (TAYLOR L S)
by applicantIT1271922