Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0886319

EP0886319 - Method for making a thin film transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.10.2003  [2003/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimogaichi, Yasushi
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Hayashi, Hisao
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111151.117.06.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateJP1997017899319.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17899397
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0886319
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0886319
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0886319
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/786, H01L21/336, H01L21/20
[2000/01]
Former International [1998/52]H01L29/786, H01L21/336
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode zur Herstellung eines Dünnschichttransistors[1998/52]
English:Method for making a thin film transistor[1998/52]
French:Méthode de fabrication d'un transistor à couche mince[1998/52]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2002Fee for grant paid
10.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09139506  ;
 [X]JPS60245124  ;
 [Y]US5432122  (CHAE KIE S [KR]) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 2; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]US5610737  (AKIYAMA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 10 * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 25; figure 8 *;
 [A]JPH05152312  ;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09139506 A 19970527 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-16 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860419), vol. 010, no. 104, Database accession no. (E - 397), & JP60245124 A 19851204 (SONY KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - MEI P ET AL, "GRAIN GROWTH IN LASER DEHYDROGENATED AND CRYSTALLIZED POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON FOR THIN FILM TRANSISTORS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 76, no. 5, ISSN 0021-8979, page 3194-3199, XP000466425 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.357505
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930928), vol. 017, no. 538, Database accession no. (E - 1440), & JP05152312 A 19930618 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  - MAMORU FURUTA ET AL, "BOTTOM-GATE POLY-SI THIN FILM TRANSISTORS USING XECL EXCIMER LASER ANNEALING AND ION DOPING TECHNIQUES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 40, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9383, page 1964-1969, XP000413116 [A] 5,14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.239735
ExaminationUS5943593
 EP0681316