blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0936737 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0936737



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 373
22.02.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.03.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.03.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
02.03.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
02.03.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
16.11.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.11.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.11.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 70
05.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 9
05.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 9
05.01.2006 Description Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Description Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 9
05.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 9
05.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.05.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.10.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 80
24.01.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
18.06.1998 Abstract Search / examination 2
18.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 12
18.06.1998 Description Search / examination 46
18.06.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 15
18.06.1998 Priority document Search / examination 54
18.06.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7