blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0936737


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.03.2008  [2008/13]
16.03.2007 (Expected) grant published on  18.04.2007  [2007/16]
10.03.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.03.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.11.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.01.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.10.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.09.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.05.2005 First examination report
30.04.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
02.07.2001 Renewal fee
25.09.2000 Change - extension states
28.07.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
04.07.2000 Renewal fee
04.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  22.03.2000 [2000/12]
19.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
02.07.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.08.1999 [1999/33]