blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0936737
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH11234349Global Dossier 27.08.1999A
Priority number Date
JP3436998 17.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0936737Global Dossier 18.04.2007B1
EP0936737 05.01.2000A3
EP0936737 18.08.1999A2
Priority number Date
JP3436998 17.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69837593T 27.12.2007T2
DE69837593D 31.05.2007D1
Priority number Date
JP3436998 17.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6393069 21.05.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP3436998 17.02.1998