blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0936737

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure02.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted18.04.2007
Opposition procedure21.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.03.2008 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.08.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:18.08.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:22.03.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000124
 
Event date:13.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:22.06.2005 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050504
 
Event date:18.04.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:31.05.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69837593
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070531
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:05.10.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:26.03.2008 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20080121
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140618
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20140611
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20140609
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:01.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69837593 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150618
 
Event date:01.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20160229
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150618
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160101
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630