Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936737

EP0936737 - Circuit and method for compensating for degradation in pulse width of burst data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.2008  [2008/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shibata, Kohei, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 - 8588 / JP
[1999/33]
Representative(s)von Fischern, Bernhard , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111198.218.06.1998
[1999/33]
Priority number, dateJP1998003436917.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3436998
[1999/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0936737
Date:18.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0936737
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936737
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03K7/08, H04L25/49
[1999/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1999/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltung und Verfahren zur Kompensierung von Pulsbreitendegradierung von Burstdaten[1999/33]
English:Circuit and method for compensating for degradation in pulse width of burst data[1999/33]
French:Circuit et procédé pour compenser la dégradation de la largeur d' impulsion de données en rafale[1999/33]
Examination procedure24.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
04.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2007Fee for grant paid
02.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2296366  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-22 * page 5, line 12 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 1; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2164812  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 28; figures 6,8,10 * * page 5, line 65 - page 7, line 28; figure 11 *;
 [A]US5373400  (KOVACS JANOS [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5498993  (OHTSUKA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 8, line 8 - column 11, line 34; figure 7 *;
 [A]US5281810  (FOOKS ELIK I [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 61; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5359238  (LESKO ALAN J [US]) [A] 1-22 * figure 1; claim 1 *