Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0886232

EP0886232 - Reader and/or writer apparatus, power feeding system, and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Kokusai Electric Inc.
14-20, Higashi-Nakano 3-Chome
Nakano-ku
Tokyo 164-0003 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Kokusai Electric Inc.
14-20, Higashi-Nakano 3-Chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo 164-0003 / JP
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Kokusai Electric Inc.
14-20, Higashi-Nakano 3-Chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo 164 / JP
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
14-20, Higashi-Nakano 3-Chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo 164 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayashi, Yoshihiko
9-15, Nozawa-4-chome
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Suga, Takashi
14-1-902, Kamoi-1-chome
Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP
03 / Uesaka, Kouichi
850-140, Maiokacho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi / JP
04 / Yoshino, Ryouzou
1116-3, Tokawa
Hadano-shi / JP
05 / Igarashi, Keisuke
14-6, Ozakudai-3-chome
Hamura-shi / JP
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Gallileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111200.618.06.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateJP1997016475920.06.1997         Original published format: JP 16475997
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0886232
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0886232
Date:14.05.2003
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0886232
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/08, G06K7/10, H01Q7/00
[2003/20]
Former International [1998/52]G06K7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/06]
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schreib-/Lesevorrichtung, Stromversorgungssystem und Kommunikationssystem[1998/52]
English:Reader and/or writer apparatus, power feeding system, and communication system[1998/52]
French:Lecteur-enregistreur, système d'alimentation et système de communication[1998/52]
Examination procedure18.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/52]
02.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2007Fee for grant paid
24.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0693733  (SONY CHEMICALS CORP) [X] 1-22 * column 1, line 3 - column 5, line 57 * * column 11, line 7 - column 13, line 25 * * column 16, line 52 - column 25, line 5 *;
 [Y]JPH08263610  ;
 [Y]EP0766200  (SONY CHEMICALS CORP) [Y] 4-6,10-12,14 * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 14 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 28 * * page 7, line 39 - page 9, line 16 *;
 [Y]EP0722094  (SONY CHEMICALS CORP) [Y] 1-22 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 25 *;
 [A]GB2295297  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP ;MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC SEMICONDUC (JP)) [A] 1-22 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 4 * * page 14, paragraph 7 - page 17, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]US5218371  (COPELAND RICHARD L ET AL) [A] 1-22 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 15 *;
 [A]EP0714073  (INNOVATRON IND SA) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 17 - column 5, line 41 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08263610 A 19961011 (OTEC DENSHI KK) [Y] 1-3,7-9,13,15-22 * abstract *