Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887947

EP0887947 - Method of controlling transmitting power of a base station in a CDMA mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mimura, Yukie
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus , et al
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111214.718.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateJP1997017207227.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17207297
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0887947
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0887947
Date:31.07.2002
[2002/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0887947
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/17]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Sendeleistungsregelung einer Basisstation in einem CDMA Mobilkommunikationssystem[2004/21]
English:Method of controlling transmitting power of a base station in a CDMA mobile communication system[1999/01]
French:Procédé de contrôle de la puissance de transmission d'une station de base dans un système de communication mobile[1999/01]
Former [1999/01]Verfahren zur Sendeleistungsregelung von einem Basisstation in einem CDMA mobilen Kommunikationssystem
Examination procedure25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/35]
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2004Fee for grant paid
12.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
30.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH0936801  (NEC CORP) [X] 1,5,7,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] * * figures 2,3 * [A] 3,4,9;
 [A]WO9709794  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0656716  (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [A] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5634195  (SAWYER FRANCOIS [CA]) [A] 3,4,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 42 *;
 [A]GB2300546  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 3,4,9 * abstract * * page 18, lines 2-24 *
 [AD]  - SALMASI A ET AL, "ON THE SYSTEM DESIGN ASPECTS OF CODE DIVISION MULTIPLE ACCESS (CDMA) APPLIED TO DIGITAL CELLULAR AND PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19910519), vol. CONF. 41, ISBN 0-87942-582-2, pages 57 - 62, XP000260154 [AD] 1,5,7,10 * page 57 - page 60; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1991.140445