EP0886261 - High-hat stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurosaki, Makoto c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98111353.3 | 19.06.1998 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | JP19970164074 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16407497 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0886261 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0886261 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886261 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10D13/06 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
G10D13/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/44] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halterung für Hi-hat Gerät | [1998/52] | English: | High-hat stand | [1998/52] | French: | Pied de cymbale double à coulisse | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 24.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.06.2004 | [2005/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5018426 (SUZUKI SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 12 - line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US5044249 (HOSHINO YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | JPH03251895 [ ] (HOSHINO GAKKI CO LTD); | [AP]US5717152 (LIAO TSUN-CHI [TW]) [AP] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 19; figures 7A,7B * |