Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974460 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974460



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 109
15.05.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.06.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.06.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
29.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
29.01.2000 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
28.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
30.09.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.09.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
27.08.1999 Description Search / examination 5
27.08.1999 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.08.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.01.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 European search report Search / examination 2
31.08.1998 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
17.07.1998 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
17.07.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.06.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
23.06.1998 Description Search / examination 12
23.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
23.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 3
23.06.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6