Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974460


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.06.2008 Change - representative published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
11.05.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.06.2001 [2001/26]
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
26.05.2000 (Expected) grant published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
22.05.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 First examination report
19.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
25.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
01.09.1999 Examination report or reply
02.08.1999 Examination report or reply