Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974460

EP0974460 - Method and device for controlling the ink transfer in an inking unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FGD, Forschungsgesellschaft Druckmaschinen e.V.
Lyoner Strasse 18
60528 Frankfurt / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Brötz, Helmut, Dr.-Ing.
Parkst. 24
65549 Limburg / DE
02 / Hars, Christoph, Dr.-Ing.
Am Erlenberg 11
64354 Reinheim / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG
Intellectual Property (IPB)
Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [2000/04]Stahl, Dietmar
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung FTB/S, Postfach 101264
63012 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date98111516.523.06.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974460
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974460
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/00, B41F31/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/28]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung des Farbtransportes in einem Farbwerk[2000/04]
English:Method and device for controlling the ink transfer in an inking unit[2000/04]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour réguler le transfert de l'encre dans un appareil d'encrage[2000/04]
Examination procedure03.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
05.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.1999Fee for grant paid
10.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE1953590  (KELLER, LEO) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11;
 [X]DE2948486  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH) [X] 6,16,17 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPS61163859  ;
 [Y]DE2942750  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH) [Y] 11 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE2932843  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH) [Y] 11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0407708  (RUEESCH FERD AG) [Y] 11 * abstract *;
 [X]DE2360611  (GRAPHO METRONIC GMBH & CO;ROLAND OFFSETMASCHF) [X] 1-4,7,12,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0509226  (SENGEWALD KARL H GMBH; KOBUSCH FOLIEN GMBH & CO KG (DE)) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1749316  (WOOD NEWSPAPER MACHINERY CORPORATION) [A] 5,10 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3338143  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861209), vol. 10, no. 368, Database accession no. (M - 543), & JP61163859 A 19860724 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-3,8,14,15 * abstract *